Individual Personnel Data
Name |
Taylor, Everett Andrew ‡ |
Rank |
Staff Sergeant |
Serial Number |
38137855 ‡ |
Unit Assignments |
Assigned to the 544th Bombardment Squadron (Heavy), per Gowen Field, Boise, Idaho, Special Orders #32 dated 1 February 1943, effective 1 February 1943. |
Duty |
Engineer / Top Turret Gunner |
Last Duty Date |
12 April 1943 |
Results |
Transferred |
Additional Information | |
Photo Album: | Crew Photo Album⇗ |
Crew Composition When Assigned to the 384th BG
Original 384th Combat Crew
CREWMEMBER |
POSITION |
RESULTS |
2nd Lt. Hausenfluck, Jesse Dee, Jr⇗ | Pilot | KIA |
2nd Lt. MacKenzie, Donald B⇗ | Co-pilot | KIA |
2nd Lt. Everson, Charles W⇗ | Navigator | POW |
2nd Lt. Kennedy, Robert J⇗ | Bombardier | POW |
SGT. Bucheri, Sebastian (NMI)⇗ | Radio Operator / Gunner | POW |
PVT. Kilcourse, John Thomas⇗ | Engineer / Top Turret Gunner | POW |
S/SGT. Taylor, Everett Andrew | Engineer / Top Turret Gunner | TR |
SGT. Traylor, James Audin⇗ | Ball Turret Gunner | POW |
SGT. Gregori, Raymond Patrick⇗ | Tail Gunner | WIA |
S/SGT. Kelley, John R⇗ | Flexible Gunner | POW |
Crew History The Hausenfluck Crew joined the 544th BS at Wendover on 1 February 1943. Identified as "Crew #3" on the assignment order, they became the first "Crew #43" in the squadron.
Before moving to England, Taylor was transferred to the 354th B HQ AAB Squadron at Sioux City, Iowa. Taylor was replaced on the crew by S/Sgt John C Blauer, who joined the squadron on 19 April 1943 at Sioux City, Iowa.
The crew flew to England and flew most of their missions together, with minimal substitutions, until they were shot down on 17 August 1943, the "First Schweinfurt" mission. Pilot Hausenfluck and copilot Mackenzie were KIA, and the remainder of the crew became POWs for the rest of the war.
|
Every effort has been expended to ensure all information on this page is complete and accurate.
Please inform webmaster of any discrepancies or omissions by using the button below.